skip to content

Jakda, Ahmed Ibrahim

CPSO#: 88053

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Oct 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Oct 2009
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Palliative Care
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4380
Fax: (519) 749-4208 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jakda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 10 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Apr 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Jun 2010

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2010 Active
             Dr.  Ahmed Ibrahim Jakda may practise medicine independently in palliative care
            medicine, only.