THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:29:50 AM
Jakda, Ahmed Ibrahim
CPSO#:
88053
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Palliative Care
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4380
Fax: (519) 749-4208
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's Memorial Hospital |
St Marys |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Apr 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jan 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 27 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jun 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 16 Jun 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jun 2010 |
|
Active |