skip to content

Jain, Hem Chand

CPSO#: 31572

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Jain, Hen Chand (used until: 14 Dec 2003 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Calgary, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
927 King Street East
Cambridge ON  N3H 3P4
Phone: (519) 650-0006
Fax: (519) 650-6060 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. H.C. Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jain ( CPSO# 31572 )

Business Address:
302 - 927 King Street East
Cambridge ON  N3H 3P4
Phone Number: (519) 650-0006


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 21 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEM CHAND JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1980