THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
08/05/24 0:21:18 AM
Jain, Hem Chand
CPSO#:
31572
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Jain, Hen Chand (used until: 14 Dec 2003 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Calgary, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
927 King Street East
Cambridge ON N3H 3P4
Phone: (519) 650-0006
Fax: (519) 650-6060
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
USA - Arizona
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:21 May 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEM CHAND JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1980 |