skip to content

Jafferjee, Juzar Hashim

CPSO#: 89733

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 May 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 May 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili

Education:Jawaharlal Nehru Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6420 Beatty Line N
Unit 204
Fergus ON  N1M 2W3 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jafferjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jafferjee ( CPSO# 89733 )

Business Address:
801 St. David Street North
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Phone Number: (519) 843-4380

Business Address:
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUZAR HASHIM JAFFERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFFERJEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2011