THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:00:22 PM
Jafferjee, Juzar Hashim
CPSO#:
89733
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 May 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili
Education: Jawaharlal Nehru Medical College, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6420 Beatty Line N
Unit 204
Fergus ON N1M 2W3
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Groves Memorial Community Hospital |
Fergus |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUZAR HASHIM JAFFERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFFERJEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 25 Nov 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2011 |