skip to content

Jaffer, Kassamali Mohamed Fazel

CPSO#: 28127

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kassamali Jaffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 Regis Cres S North York ON M3J 1Y6 (416) - 398 - 0638
Date Received: 09 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: March 9, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kassamali Mohamed Fazel Jaffer to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 9, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Jaffer engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in the practice of obstetrics and gynecology. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Jaffer may only practise as a surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified surgeon. Further, Dr. Jaffer may only practice at William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital.