THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:30:45 AM
Jaffer, Kassamali Mohamed Fazel
CPSO#:
28127
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Mar 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati
Education: McMaster University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kassamali Jaffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 Regis Cres S
North York ON M3J 1Y6
(416) - 398 - 0638
Date Received: 09 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:13 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Apr 1976 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 9, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kassamali Mohamed Fazel Jaffer to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 9, 2018:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Jaffer engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in the practice of obstetrics and gynecology. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Jaffer may only practise as a surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified surgeon. Further, Dr. Jaffer may only practice at William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital.