skip to content

Jaddou, Rita Saleem

CPSO#: 97434

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Assyrian, English

Education:University of Mosul, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Family Health Team
Suite 245
2475 McDougall Street
Windsor ON  N8X 3N9
Phone: (519) 250-5656 Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Jan 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2015 Active
             Dr. Rita Saleem Jaddou may practise medicine independently in family medicine.