THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 6:09:01 AM
Jaddou, Rita Saleem
CPSO#:
97434
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
17 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, Assyrian, English
Education: University of Mosul, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Family Health Team
Suite 245
2475 McDougall Street
Windsor ON N8X 3N9
Phone: (519) 250-5656
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 16 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jan 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 16 Jan 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jan 2015 |
|
Active |