skip to content

Jada, Naim George

CPSO#: 95557

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Apr 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
167 Rolph St
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone: (519) 842-3611 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:21 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAIM GEORGE JADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JADA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2018