THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 22:18:10 PM
Jada, Naim George
CPSO#:
95557
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Apr 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Apr 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Queen's University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
302-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Phone: 705-725-9090
Fax: 705-725-9192
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brightshores Health System |
Owen Sound |
Lakeridge Health |
Oshawa |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
West Parry Sound Health Centre |
Parry Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:21 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAIM GEORGE JADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JADA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 22 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Apr 2018 |