skip to content

Stewart, Jocelyn Melissa

CPSO#: 115311

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100-222 King St E
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: 905-623-0323
Fax: 905-697-0230 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jocelyn Stewart and Jeffrey Craig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Craig ( CPSO# 92764 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 115311)

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
Positive Care Clinic
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 668-6831

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
Positive Care Clinic
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 668-6831

Business Address:
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1212

Business Address:
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1212

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jun 2021 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOCELYN MELISSA STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Sep 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2021