skip to content

Sarco, Jean Pierre

CPSO#: 96747

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Nov 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidad San Martin De Porres, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chancellors Way Medical Arts Centre
175 Chancellors Way, Suite 103
Guelph ON  N1G 5K1
Phone: (519) 830-9750
Fax: (519) 821-5151 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

35 UPPER CENTENNIAL PARKWAY
UNIT 1A
SOUTHMOUNT MEDICAL BUILDING
STONEY CREEK
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Canada
Phone: 519-830-9750
Fax: 519-821-5151
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jean Pierre Sarco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sarco ( CPSO# 96747 )

Business Address:
103 - 175 Chancellors Way
Guelph ON  N1G 5K1
Phone Number: (519) 830-9750

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 04 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEAN PIERRE SARCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARCO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 23 Nov 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 24 Nov 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 05 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 04 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2016
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.