skip to content

O'Neill, John Marmion David

CPSO#: 78167

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2004
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6009
Fax: (905) 540-6590 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 104, 144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G3K9
Canada
Phone: 9056485900
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. O'Neill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. O'Neill ( CPSO# 78167 )

Business Address:
G2 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
Suite 104
1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Radiology
50 Charlton Avenue East
D1
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6009


Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. So ( CPSO# 76100 )
Dr. N. Muhn ( CPSO# 79555 )
Dr. J. Coret-Simon ( CPSO# 79858 )
Dr. F. Al-Douri ( CPSO# 81593 )
Dr. R. Rebello ( CPSO# 71123 )
Dr. V. Leung ( CPSO# 93077 )
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 84853 )
Dr. S. Harish ( CPSO# 83316 )
Dr. A. Coret ( CPSO# 79859 )
Dr. M. Voss ( CPSO# 74024 )
Dr. J. O'Neill ( CPSO# 78167 )
Dr. C. Boylan ( CPSO# 78775 )
Dr. O. Mironov ( CPSO# 107610)
Dr. A. Alabousi ( CPSO# 95414 )
Dr. E. Stubbs ( CPSO# 96256 )
Dr. M. El-Khodary ( CPSO# 99328 )
Dr. J. Kwok-Liu ( CPSO# 29730 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-6009

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
G2 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
104- 1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Business Address:
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 207
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone Number: (905) 389-0300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2004 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011 Active
             Dr.  John  Marmion  David  O'Neill   may  practice  medicine  independently  in
            Radiology, only.