skip to content

Brown, James Craymer

CPSO#: 92084

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Sep 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Interventional Pain Specialists
8760 Jane St
Unit B05B
Vaughan ON  L4K 0E8
Phone: 905 237 4623
Fax: 905 237 5098 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 McKay St.
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Canada
Phone: 6137323675 Ext. 8109
Fax: 6136334598
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: James C. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Brown ( CPSO# 22173 )
Dr. J. Brown ( CPSO# 92084 )

Business Address:
Unit 1-A
9625 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 237-4623


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:11 Sep 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2019 Active
 Dr.  James  Craymer Brown may practise medicine independently in Interventional
            Chronic Pain Management, and low-risk non-surgical cosmetic procedures.


Dear members, your member portal will be unavailable for maintenance and updates from August 5th 5pm to August 9th 9am. We apologize for the inconvenience and appreciate your patience.