skip to content

Ivantchev, Sergei

CPSO#: 87435

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian, Russian

Education:N.Testemitanu State Medical and Pharma, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Upper River Valley Hospital
11300 Route 130
Waterville NB  E7P 0A4
Phone: (506) 375-5900
Fax: (506) 375-2772

Additional Practice Location(s)

Providence Health, Fairfield
1810 US-321 S, Winnsboro, SC 29180
Columbia SC  29180
United States
Phone: 8033658100
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick
USA - South Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SERGEI IVANTCHEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IVANTCHEV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2009