THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 11:53:43 AM
Ivantchev, Sergei
CPSO#:
87435
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian, Russian
Education: N.Testemitanu State Medical and Pharma, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Upper River Valley Hospital
11300 Route 130
Waterville NB E7P 0A4
Phone: (506) 375-5900
Fax: (506) 375-2772
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
USA - South Carolina
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SERGEI IVANTCHEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IVANTCHEV is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2009 |