skip to content

Istasy, Victor Fayez

CPSO#: 85150

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioner Street West
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 52123 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Istasy & Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Istasy ( CPSO# 85150 )
Dr. H. Youssef ( CPSO# 102376)

Business Address:
785 Wonderland Road South
Suite 250
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jul 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VICTOR FAYEZ ISTASY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISTASY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010