Youssef, Heba Saadalla Sorieal (CPSO#: 102376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West London Family Health Clinic
Unit 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: (519) 641-6712
Fax: (519) 641-6189
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Istasy & Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Youssef ( CPSO# 102376)
Dr. V. Istasy ( CPSO# 85150 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
785 Wonderland Road South
Suite 250
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712


Corporation Name: Dixon Cunningham-Dunlop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Youssef ( CPSO# 102376)
Dr. F. Sargolzaei ( CPSO# 93341 )
Dr. B. Choudhary ( CPSO# 96892 )
Dr. J. Zhu ( CPSO# 96742 )
Dr. G. Abdel Malek ( CPSO# 86844 )
Dr. D. Dixon ( CPSO# 65384 )
Dr. B. Yemchuk ( CPSO# 51884 )
Dr. Y. Li ( CPSO# 95285 )
Dr. D. Martyniak ( CPSO# 93596 )
Dr. S. Cunningham-Dunlop ( CPSO# 103184)

Business Address:
West London Family Health Clinic
Unit 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEBA SAADALLA SORIEAL YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Nov 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2014