skip to content

Irwin, Roy Stewart

CPSO#: 11620

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1943

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1866
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1944
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Apr 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 1987