THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:43:41 AM
Irwin, Roy Stewart
CPSO#:
11620
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Toronto, 1943
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1866 |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 1944 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Apr 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Aug 1987 |