skip to content

Iqbal, Bland

CPSO#: 85692

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 426-0130
Fax: (519) 429-6998 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bland Iqbal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Iqbal ( CPSO# 85692 )

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:23 Aug 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013 Active
             Dr.  Bland  Iqbal may practice medicine independently in internal medicine as a
            hospitalist, only.