THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 2:06:00 AM
Iqbal, Bland
CPSO#:
85692
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Dow Medical College, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 426-0130
Fax: (519) 429-6998
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Bland Iqbal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 18 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:23 Aug 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jan 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 May 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 03 May 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 May 2013 |
|
Active |