skip to content

Imrie, John David

CPSO#: 22004

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Dr. Imrie’s medical record requests can be requested by emailing him at [email protected] . If a patient does not have access to email, the College can write to Dr. Imrie directly.
Date Received: 22 May 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2015