THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:22:29 PM
Imrie, John David
CPSO#:
22004
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Jun 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Imrie’s medical record requests can be requested by emailing him at [email protected] . If a patient does not have access to email, the College can write to Dr. Imrie directly.
Date Received: 22 May 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1968 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jun 2015 |