skip to content

Hyrcza, Martin Dominik

CPSO#: 94289

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2010 to 22 Aug 2010
EL - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
EL - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
EL - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2018