THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:12:28 AM
Hyrcza, Martin Dominik
CPSO#:
94289
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2010 to 22 Aug 2010
EL - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
EL - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
EL - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2018 |