skip to content

Huwedi Abouanaser, Salaheddin Faraj

CPSO#: 87919

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
424 Luke Wing
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6021
Fax: (905) 521-6083 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

SUITE 9
788 UPPER OTTAWA STREET
Hamilton ON  L8T3V2
Canada
Phone: 2897554427
Fax: 2897554428
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Maisa Dekna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Huwedi Abouanaser ( CPSO# 87919 )
Dr. M. Dekna ( CPSO# 88257 )

Business Address:
302 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 523-7920

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare Services
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Huwedi Abouanaser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Huwedi Abouanaser ( CPSO# 87919 )
Dr. M. Dekna ( CPSO# 88257 )

Business Address:
424 Luke Wing
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 13 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SALAHEDDIN FARAJ HUWEDI ABOUANASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUWEDI ABOUANASER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 20 Mar 2008
PEAP - Resident - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 21 Mar 2008 to 20 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 21 Mar 2009 to 20 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 21 Mar 2010 to 20 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 21 Mar 2011 to 20 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 21 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 06 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
Clinical Fellow - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014