THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 0:41:30 AM
Huwedi Abouanaser, Salaheddin Faraj
CPSO#:
87919
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
424 Luke Wing
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6021
Fax: (905) 521-6083
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:13 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SALAHEDDIN FARAJ HUWEDI ABOUANASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUWEDI ABOUANASER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 20 Mar 2008
PEAP - R - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 21 Mar 2008 to 20 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 21 Mar 2009 to 20 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 21 Mar 2010 to 20 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 21 Mar 2011 to 20 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 21 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 06 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
CF - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 May 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2014 |