skip to content

Hutchings, Katherine Keri

CPSO#: 94907

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Katherine Hutchings Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Meno Ya Win Health Centre Meno Ya Win Way Sioux Lookout, ON P8T 1B4 Phone: 807-737-3030
Instructions: All medical records will be retained by the hospital above.
Date Received: 25 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:06 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 04 Apr 2011 to 01 May 2011
EL - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018