THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 22:20:58 PM
Hutchings, Katherine Keri
CPSO#:
94907
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Katherine Hutchings Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:All medical records will be retained by the hospital above.
Meno Ya Win Health Centre
Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout, ON P8T 1B4
Phone: 807-737-3030
Date Received: 25 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:06 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 04 Apr 2011 to 01 May 2011
EL - Pediatric General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |