skip to content

Hussain, Tabassum Musarrat

CPSO#: 87332

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5501 N University Drive
Suite 104
Coral Springs, FL 33067
Coral Springs FL  33067
United States
Phone: 9547570670

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TABASSUM MUSARRAT HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2014