THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 22:59:28 PM
Hussain, Tabassum Musarrat
CPSO#:
87332
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5501 N University Drive
Suite 104
Coral Springs, FL 33067
Coral Springs FL 33067
United States
Phone: 9547570670
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TABASSUM MUSARRAT HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2014 |