skip to content

Hurdalek, Jiri Theodore

CPSO#: 31015

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 17-Nov-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:J.E. Purkyne University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016