THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 3:38:42 AM
Hurdalek, Jiri Theodore
CPSO#:
31015
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jul 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
17-Nov-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English
Education: J.E. Purkyne University, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:13 Mar 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1972 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Dec 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |