skip to content

Hunt, George Denys

CPSO#: 23160

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Manchester Medical School, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Denys Hunt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 7 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: West Parry Sound Health Centre at (705) 746-9321 ask for Health Records Dept.
Date Received: 22 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:01 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Aug 2014