THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:31:17 AM
Hunt, George Denys
CPSO#:
23160
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Manchester Medical School, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Denys Hunt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 7 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:West Parry Sound Health Centre at (705) 746-9321 ask for Health Records Dept.
Date Received: 22 Aug 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Dec 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 1970 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2014 |