skip to content

Hunkin, John Bradley

CPSO#: 28198

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Thompson Hunkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2019

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 26, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Bradley Hunkin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective July 26, 2016:

College has received information regarding Dr. Hunkin's standard of practice arising from a reassessment of his practice. As a result:

- Dr. Hunkin will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least 12 months.

- Dr. Hunkin will engage in professional education in opioid prescribing and medical record-keeping.

- Dr. Hunkin's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.