THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 11:17:49 AM
Hunkin, John Bradley
CPSO#:
28198
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Thompson Hunkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: July 26, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Bradley Hunkin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective July 26, 2016:
College has received information regarding Dr. Hunkin's standard of practice arising from a reassessment of his practice. As a result:
- Dr. Hunkin will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least 12 months.
- Dr. Hunkin will engage in professional education in opioid prescribing and medical record-keeping.
- Dr. Hunkin's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.