skip to content

Huang, Kitty

CPSO#: 93690

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Shun, Kitty (used until: 14 Oct 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Rd
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. K. Huang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Huang ( CPSO# 93690 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone Number: (519) 253-5253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KITTY HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2018