THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:50:13 AM
Huang, Kitty
CPSO#:
93690
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Shun, Kitty (used until: 14 Oct 2010 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Rd
Windsor ON N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. K. Huang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 8 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KITTY HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2018 |