skip to content

Hu, Lin Aung Rex

CPSO#: 89456

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Burmese, English

Education:Institue of Medicine II, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Golden Mile Walk-in Clinic
1880 Eglinton Avenue E, #152
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone: (416) 285-7575
Fax: 416-285-7574 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010
Corporation Name: Dr. Rex Hu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hu ( CPSO# 89456 )

Business Address:
Suite 152
1880 Eglinton Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone Number: (416) 553-5248


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LIN AUNG REX HU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2011