THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 19:18:22 PM
Hu, Lin Aung Rex
CPSO#:
89456
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Burmese, English
Education: Institue of Medicine II, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
250 W 5th St
Hanford CA 93230-5029
United States
Phone: 8779603426
Fax: 5597341247
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Pennsylvania
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LIN AUNG REX HU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HU is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2011 |