skip to content

Hsu, Tina Yun-Chin

CPSO#: 84998

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jan 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Tina Hsu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hsu ( CPSO# 84998 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TINA YUN-CHIN HSU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2011