THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:07:53 PM
Hsu, Tina Yun-Chin
CPSO#:
84998
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:31 Dec 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TINA YUN-CHIN HSU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2011 |