skip to content

Horak, Ladislav

CPSO#: 24877

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jul 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian, Slovak

Education:P.J. Safarika University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. L. Horak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2015