THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 6:58:34 AM
Horak, Ladislav
CPSO#:
24877
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jul 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian, Slovak
Education: P.J. Safarika University, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. L. Horak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Jun 2015 |