skip to content

Hopgood, Derek Charles

CPSO#: 28612

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Aug 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
sault area hospital
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6A 2Z3
Phone: (705) 7593434 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Derek Hopgood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hopgood ( CPSO# 28612 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: 7052549203

Business Address:
118 March Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 253-9671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEREK CHARLES HOPGOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOPGOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1976