THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 22:46:35 PM
Hopgood, Derek Charles
CPSO#:
28612
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Aug 1976
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Aug 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
sault area hospital
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2Z3
Phone: (705) 7593434
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEREK CHARLES HOPGOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOPGOOD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 1976 |